+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Monday, 21 March 2011
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 23 February 2011
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 31 March 2011
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 25, 2011
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Taddiken was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Taddiken
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Otto was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative C. Holmes was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative C. Holmes
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (6)
FA_2011_HB2027_S_2005
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Taddiken was adopted
CR_2011_HB2027_S_1727
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2027_H_1518
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Otto was rejected
FA_2011_HB2027_H_1475
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
FA_2011_HB2027_H_1512
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative C. Holmes was adopted
CR_2011_HB2027_H_1304
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor