+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 07, 2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, April 3, 2017
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 114 Nay: 11
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2017_HB2025_S_1624
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2017_HB2025_H_0411
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor