+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 281-N
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on General Government Budget; Referred to Committee on Education Budget
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Educational Planning Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor