+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 16 February 2011
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 21, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 85 Nay: 33
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_HB2017_H_0700
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Special Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor