+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011
- Reengrossed on Monday, 16 May 2011
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Schodorf, Senator Vratil and Senator Hensley appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Aurand , Representative Huebert and Representative Ward as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 1
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_HB2015_S_2903
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2011_HB2015_H_1312
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2015_S_2098
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 12, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 12, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Educational Planning Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor