+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
- No other line items reconsidered; vetoes sustained.
- Approved by the Governor except line item veto of Secs. 26, 108(e), 108(f) & 115(a); portions of 111(a), 143(a) & 175.
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011
- Reengrossed on Monday, 16 May 2011
- Motion to reconsider line item veto of Secs. 115(a) & portion of 143(a) failed: Veto Sustained. Yea: 50 Nay: 44
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 69 Nay: 55
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
- Conference committee report now available
- Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011
- Representative Carlson replaces Representative Kelley on the Conference Committee
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Vratil and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rhoades , Representative Feuerborn and Representative Kelley as conferees
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Masterson
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 23
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Received and Introduced
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative D. Gatewood
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Henry
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goodman was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goodman
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goico was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhoades was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goico
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative D. Gatewood was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhoades
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhoades was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhoades
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hineman
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carlin
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hineman
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 40
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hineman was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 71
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Henry
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted Yea: 91 Nay: 26
- Representative Bollier raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lane was rejected Yea: 32 Nay: 87
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lane
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
- Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2011, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
- Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (15)
CCR_2011_HB2014_S_2932
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
FA_2011_HB2014_S_1234
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 23
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1029
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1059
Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1022
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1021
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lane was rejected Yea: 32 Nay: 87
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1048
Representative Bollier raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1039
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hineman
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1047
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hineman was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 71
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1036
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goodman was adopted
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1025
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative D. Gatewood
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1027
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhoades was withdrawn
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1019
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goico was adopted
CR_2011_HB2014_H_0793
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhoades
FA_2011_HB2014_H_1012
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rhoades was adopted