+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 05, 2017
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2010_H_1142
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor