+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 09 May 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 5
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 784 DSOB
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_HB2010_S_2869
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2011_HB2010_S_2368
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
FA_2011_HB2010_S_2383
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 5, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor