+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 03, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 04, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, February 02 , 2015
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 20, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 30, 2014
+ − Amendment
CR_2015_HB2009_H_0502
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Post Audit Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor