+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 31 March 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 02, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 03, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_HB2008_H_1070
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2011: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 14, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor