+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, May 06 , 2016
On May 1, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Sunday, May 01, 2016
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Friday, April 29 , 2016
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 115 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Arpke replaces Senator Baumgardner on the Conference Committee
- Senator Baumgardner replaces Senator Arpke on the Conference Committee
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Highland , Representative Lunn and Representative Winn as conferees
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 04 , 2015
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 112N
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 30, 2014
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2016_HB2008_S_4243
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
CR_2016_HB2008_S_3916
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2015_HB2008_H_0692
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 5, 2015: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Post Audit Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor