+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 11, 2012
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 08 May 2012
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Schodorf, Senator Vratil and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Aurand , Representative Huebert and Representative Ward as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Education
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 81 Nay: 40
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Flaharty was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Flaharty
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 19, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 784 DSOB
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2012_HB2004_S_5311
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
FA_2012_HB2004_S_5056
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
CR_2012_HB2004_S_4788
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2011_HB2004_H_1456
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Flaharty was rejected
CR_2011_HB2004_H_1044
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 30, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor