+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 10 April 2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 04, 2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Ostmeyer was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Ostmeyer
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 1
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 01, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 11, 2012
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2014_HB2002_S_3700
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was withdrawn
FA_2014_HB2002_S_3352
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Ostmeyer was adopted
CR_2013_HB2002_H_0888
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2014: Concurred with amendments
March 25, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 26, 2013: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Post Audit Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor