+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB836ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988446146-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 988446146-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 988446146-S1
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-com: Criminal Law and Procedure
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989270146-E
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 989270146