+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2180ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 030452228-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 030452228
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor