+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (70)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929.
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 929.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 843.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 838.
- Conference committee report filed. S.J. 837.
- Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 837.
- Immediate message. S.J. 838.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 786.
- Conference committee report filed. H.J. 788.
- Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 788.
- Passed House, ayes 90, nays 8. H.J. 789.
- Immediate message. H.J. 791.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 765.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 758.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5157. S.J. 789.
- Senate refused to concur with S-5157. S.J. 790.
- Immediate message. S.J. 791.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House conference committee appointed Dolecheck, R. Taylor, Highfill, Winckler, and Steckman. H.J. 760.
- House insisted. H.J. 760.
- Immediate message. H.J. 763.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 792.
- Senate conference committee appointed, Schoenjahn, Horn, Quirmbach, Sinclair, and Boettger. S.J. 793.
- Immediate message. S.J. 793.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Point of order raised amendment H-8279 to committee amendment H-8248 not germane. H.J. 742.
- Committee amendment H-8248 adopted. H.J. 744.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 743.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8279 to committee amendment H-8248. H.J. 742.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-8279 to committee amendment H-8248. H.J. 742.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 742.
- Amendment H-8279 to committee amendment H-8248 filed. H.J. 742.
- Amendment H-8273 filed. H.J. 745.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8272 to committee amendment H-8248. H.J. 741.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-8272 to committee amendment H-8248. H.J. 741.
- Point of order raised amendment H-8272 to committee amendment H-8248 not germane. H.J. 741.
- Amendment H-8272 to committee amendment H-8248 filed. H.J. 741.
- Amendment H-8275 filed, lost. H.J. 744.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-8273, as amended. H.J. 745.
- Amendment H-8278 to amendment H-8273 filed, adopted. H.J. 745.
- Point of order raised amendment H-8273, as amended, not germane. H.J. 745.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8273, as amended. H.J. 745.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 746.
- Amendment H-8274 filed. H.J. 746.
- Point of order raised amendment H-8274 not germane. H.J. 746.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-8274. H.J. 746.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8274. H.J. 746.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 747.
- Amendment H-8280 filed. H.J. 747.
- Amendment H-8280 lost. H.J. 748.
- Passed House, ayes 53, nays 45. H.J. 748.
- Immediate message. H.J. 749.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8248 filed. H.J. 716.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 713.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 682.
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 683.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 729.
- Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 22. S.J. 728.
- Amendment S-5129 as amended, lost. S.J. 727.
- Amendment S-5133 to S-5129 filed, adopted. S.J. 727.
- Amendment S-5127 filed, lost. S.J. 726.
- Amendment S-5129 filed. S.J. 726.
- Amendment S-5126 adopted. S.J. 726.
- Amendment S-5130 ruled out of order. S.J. 725.
- Amendment S-5130 to S-5126 filed. S.J. 725.
- Amendment S-5128 filed, lost. S.J. 725.
- Deferred. S.J. 722.
- Amendment S-5126 filed. S.J. 722.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 693.
- Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 693.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor