+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 830.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 785.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 792.
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 2. H.J. 783.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8287. H.J. 783.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 812.
- Amendment S-5165 adopted. S.J. 812.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 771.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 813.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8287 filed. H.J. 773.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Hagenow, Forbes, and Landon. H.J. 455.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 341.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded