+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn. H.J. 397.
- Substituted SF 2056. H.J. 395.
- Amendment H-8061 adopted. H.J. 395.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8061 filed. H.J. 380.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 249.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor