+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 587.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 538.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 538.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 456.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Substituted SF 2230. H.J. 386.
- Amendment H-8057 adopted. H.J. 386.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8057 filed. H.J. 380.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 191.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor