+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned, Hagenow, Garrett, and Lensing. H.J. 730.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Brandenburg, Garrett, and Lensing. H.J. 654.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 560.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 558.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 543.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 534.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 390.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 384.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Sodders Chair,Petersen, and Zaun.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor