+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Watts, Grassley, and Steckman. H.J. 730.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 675.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 673.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 646.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 645.
- Amendment S-3058 filed, adopted. S.J. 645.
- Amendment S-3065 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 645.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 391.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 385.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - State Government.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Petersen Chair,Jochum, and Anderson, B..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor