+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 778.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 718.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 718.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 610.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 616.
- Withdrawn. H.J. 612.
- Substituted SF 357. H.J. 611.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 498.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Human Resources: Wilhelm Chair,Bolkcom, and Whitver.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor