+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 985.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 948.
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 948.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 869.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 873.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 864.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1274. H.J. 863.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 782.
- Substituted for Senate File 230. S.J. 782.
- Amendment S-3135 filed, adopted. S.J. 782.
- Immediate message. S.J. 785.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 808.
- Senate amendment H-1274 filed. H.J. 815.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 230. S.J. 354.
- Message from House. S.J. 354.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 390.
- Passed House, ayes 89, nays 7. H.J. 389.
- Amendment H-1054 adopted. H.J. 389.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1054 filed. H.J. 385.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 287.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Petersen Chair,Sodders, and Schneider.
- Date Recorded