+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Danielson, Dvorsky, and Rozenboom. S.J. 736.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 505.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 447.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 435.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - State Government.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Danielson Chair,Dearden, and Sorenson.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor