+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 1114.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 1081.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1081.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 982.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 1036.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 1039.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 1033.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1443. H.J. 1033.
- Senate amendment H-1443. H.J. 1033.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 1032.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3109 out of order. S.J. 978.
- Amendment S-3221 filed, adopted. S.J. 977.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 978.
- Immediate message. S.J. 978.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 827.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3109 filed. S.J. 715.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 715.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 308.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 267.
- Message from House. S.J. 267.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 279.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays 8. H.J. 273.
- Amendment H-1003 withdrawn. H.J. 273.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1003 filed. H.J. 171.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 163.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Hogg Chair,Dvorsky, and Schneider.
- Date Recorded