+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 458.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 317.
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - State Government.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Danielson Chair,Petersen, and Feenstra.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor