+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Soderberg, Lykam, and Watts. H.J. 730.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 596.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 595.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 561.
- Passed Senate, ayes 38, nays 10. S.J. 559.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 441.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 439.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted - Commerce.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce: McCoy Chair,Petersen, and Anderson, B..
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor