+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Government. H.J. 760.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1116 filed. H.J. 566.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1079 filed. H.J. 526.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 493.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Government: Danielson Chair,Jochum, and Sorenson.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor