+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 860.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 856.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 846.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 844.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 827.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 777.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Gronstal, Dix, and Jochum. S.J. 648.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution filed, referred to Rules & Administration. S.J. 621.
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor