+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Secretary of State.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SJR 2007 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 90 nays 8.
- Substituted for HJR 2008.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hinson, Hager and Ourth.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Schneider.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor