+ − Transition
SJR15 is now HSB271
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HJR 2005 substituted.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HJR 2005.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 11:00AM Room G17.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Celsi, and Cournoyer.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Smith, R., Celsi, and Cournoyer.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Government.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bohannan and Sexton.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 15.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 11:00AM RM 111.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Smith, R., Celsi, and Cournoyer.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor