+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Watts, Grassley, and Steckman. H.J. 654.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 618.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 594.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 575.
- Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 17. S.J. 573.
- Amendment S-3027 filed, adopted. S.J. 573.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 389.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 384.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Human Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor