+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 633.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 467.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 489.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 436.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 435.
- Substituted for HF 2403. H.J. 435.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed on file. H.J. 368.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 320.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 313.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 337.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 333.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 248.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 244.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor