+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted for SF 627.
- HF 778 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 627.
- Message from House.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 68 nays 32.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 778.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 627.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Isenhart and Sieck.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Feenstra, Bolkcom, and Brown.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor