+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3214.
- Senate concurred with S-3214.
- Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 13.
- Immediate message.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- NOBA: Final
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- NOBA: House Floor
- Passed House, yeas 60 nays 39.
- Committee amendment H-1256 out of order.
- Amendment H-1276 filed, adopted.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Committee amendment H-1256 filed.
- NOBA: House Sub
- NOBA: House Full Approps
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- NOBA: Senate Floor
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
- Message from Senate.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3135 lost.
- Point of order raised on S-3130, ruled not germane.
- Amendment S-3142 to S-3136 lost.
- Amendment S-3136 adopted.
- Point of order raised on S-3144, ruled not germane.
- Amendment S-3126 adopted.
- Amendment S-3123 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3131 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3138A lost.
- Amendment S-3138B lost.
- Amendment S-3132 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3139 lost.
- Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18.
- Immediate message.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3138, S-3139, S-3142 to S-3136, and S-3144 filed.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3126, S-3130, S-3131, S-3132, S-3135, and S-3136 filed.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3123 filed.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Senate Full Approps
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.
- Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.
- Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor