+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 86, nays none.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/20/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Graber, Boden and Brown-Powers.
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 574.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Goodwin, and Quirmbach.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor