+ − Transition
SF560 is now HF842
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/06/2022 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair.
- Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair.
- Subcommittee: Goodwin, Petersen, and Sinclair.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 593.
- Attached to companion SF 593.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Attached to companion HF 842.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from House.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 842.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Bolkcom, and Dickey.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 560.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jones, Hite and Wolfe.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 545.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 8:30AM House Lounge.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jones, Gustafson and Meyer, B..
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Boulton, and Reichman.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor