+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 92, nays none.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 2.
- Subcommittee: Gobble, Isenhart and Nordman.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 1:00PM RM 24A.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Klimesh, Guth, and Smith, J.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor