+ − Transition
SF541 is now HF799
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-3106.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 799.
- Amendment H-1284 adopted.
- Amendment H-1158 withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3106.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- SF 541 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1284 filed.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1158 filed.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 11:30AM RM 24A.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2021 12:00PM House Lounge.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and R. Smith.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Bennett and Latham.
- Introduced, referred to Information Technology.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor