+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Rereferred to Judiciary.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1231 filed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1213 filed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 16.
- Amendment S-3107 adopted.
- Amendment S-3099 out of order.
- Amendment S-3108 to S-3107 lost.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3099, S-3107, and S-3108 filed.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendments H-1055, H-1056 and H-1060 filed.
- Amendments H-1049, H-1052 and H-1053 filed.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 540.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Costello, and Quirmbach.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: McKean, Gustafson and Meyer, B..
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor