+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 525.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 681 substituted.
- Amendment S-3205 filed, adopted.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 525.
- Message from House.
- Attached to similar HF 681.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 100 nays none.
- Immediate message.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 4:30PM House Lounge.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thorup, Salmon and Sunde.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Dawson, and Kinney.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor