+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-3204.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3204.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1259 to committee amendment H-1201 adopted.
- Amendment H-1259 to committee amendment H-1201 filed.
- Passed House, yeas 98 nays none.
- Committee amendment H-1201 adopted, as amended.
- Immediate message.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1201 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 12:45PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Lensing and Thompson.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of committee as SF 502.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 502.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Guth, Greene, and Hogg.
- Subcommittee: Guth, Greene, and Hogg.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor