+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 10:00AM Room 223 - Charlie Smithson's Office.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Edler, and Giddens.
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Edler, and J. Smith.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Zumbach.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor