+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to State Government.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1331 filed.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
On March 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 8:15AM House Lounge.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bohannan and Moore, T..
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 18.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 469.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 2:30PM RM 111.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Smith, R.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor