+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 2.
- Amendments H-1347 and H-1348 withdrawn.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments H-1347 and H-1348 filed.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bush, Bradley and Mascher.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from Senate.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 466.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 466.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Goodwin, and Trone Garriott.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor