+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 37, nays 12.
- Senate concurred with S-3316.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Substituted for HF 487.
- Amendment H-1329 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-1331 filed, withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1332 filed, adopted.
- Passed House, ayes 65, nays 32.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-1222 adopted.
- Amendment H-1204 out of order.
- SF 465 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3316.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Amendment H-1222 filed.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21.
- Amendment S-3161B adopted.
- Amendment S-3161A adopted.
- Amendment S-3167 lost.
- Amendment S-3168 lost.
- Amendment S-3169 lost.
- Amendment S-3166 lost.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3161, S-3166, S-3167, S-3168, and S-3169 filed.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1204 filed.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 9:30AM House Lounge
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hinson, Gustafson and Olson.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schneider, Zaun, and Boulton.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor