+ − Transition
SF444 is now HF829
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 444 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 829.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 829.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:45PM House Lounge.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2021 3:30PM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Dickey, Koelker, and Lykam.
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Isenhart and Wheeler.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 393.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 4:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mommsen, Maxwell and Running-Marquardt.
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor