+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 729.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 689.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3081 filed. S.J. 661.
- Amendment S-3073 filed. S.J. 662.
- Point of order raised on S-3083, ruled out of order. S.J. 662.
- Amendment S-3083 filed. S.J. 662.
- Amendment S-3066 adopted. S.J. 662.
- Amendment S-3079 filed, lost. S.J. 661.
- Amendment S-3081 out of order. S.J. 661.
- Amendment S-3084 filed, lost. S.J. 660.
- Amendment S-3069 adopted. S.J. 661.
- Amendment S-3072 adopted. S.J. 661.
- Motion to reconsider vote prevailed, S-3072. S.J. 660.
- Motion filed to reconsider vote on S-3072. S.J. 659.
- Amendment S-3069 filed. S.J. 659.
- Amendment S-3072 filed, adopted. S.J. 659.
- Amendment S-3068 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 658.
- Deferred. S.J. 658.
- Point of order raised on S-3073, ruled out of order. S.J. 662.
- Amendment S-3077 filed. S.J. 663.
- Point of order raised on S-3077, ruled out of order. S.J. 663.
- Amendment S-3080 filed, lost. S.J. 664.
- Immediate message. S.J. 666.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 666.
- Point of order raised on S-3088, ruled out of order. S.J. 665.
- Amendment S-3088 filed. S.J. 665.
- Amendment S-3082 lost. S.J. 665.
- Point of order raised on S-3082, ruled in order. S.J. 665.
- Amendment S-3071 filed, adopted. S.J. 663.
- Amendment S-3082 filed. S.J. 665.
- Point of order raised on S-3078, ruled out of order. S.J. 664.
- Amendment S-3078 filed. S.J. 664.
- Point of order raised on S-3076, ruled out of order. S.J. 663.
- Amendment S-3076 filed. S.J. 663.
- Point of order raised on S-3075, ruled out of order. S.J. 663.
- Amendment S-3075 filed. S.J. 663.
- Point of order raised on S-3074, ruled out of order. S.J. 663.
- Amendment S-3074 filed. S.J. 663.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
- Amendment S-3066 filed. S.J. 650.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 508.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 507.
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor