+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with S-3183.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3183.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97 nays none.
- Amendment H-1234 adopted.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1234 filed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3151 filed, adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 12.
- Immediate message.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kapucian, Celsi and Zumbach.
- Subcommittee: Kapucian, Celsi and Zumbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor