+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-3187.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3187.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96 nays none.
- Committee amendment H-1133 adopted.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1133 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 10:30AM House Lounge.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Moore, T., Hanusa and Winckler.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3074 filed, withdrawn.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 1:30PM RM 315.
- Subcommittee: Edler, Cournoyer and Quirmbach.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 1:30PM RM 315.
- Subcommittee: Edler, Cournoyer and Quirmbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor